EP0497020 - Process for coating metal and plastic to impart wood-like appearances [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.01.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1996 | Refusal of application | published on 28.02.1996 [1996/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARLEY MOULDINGS INC. Marion Virginia 24354 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/32] | For all designated states MARLEY MOULDINGS INC. Marion, Virginia 24354 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cope, Carroll W. 103 Robinhood Drive Marion, Virginia 24354 / US | [1992/32] | Representative(s) | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/32] | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London, EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91300733.2 | 30.01.1991 | [1992/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0497020 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/28, B44F9/02 | [1992/32] | CPC: |
B44F9/02 (EP,US);
C09D167/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D167/08, C08L2666/02, C08L2666/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Beschichtung von Metallen und Kunststoffen, um holzähnliches Aussehen zu erreichen | [1992/32] | English: | Process for coating metal and plastic to impart wood-like appearances | [1992/32] | French: | Procédé de revêtement des métaux et matières plastiques en vue de leur conférer l'apparence du bois | [1992/32] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 04.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/10] | 08.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1996/09] | 30.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 09.09.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1996/09] | Request for further processing for: | 28.07.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 28.07.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.08.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1995 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2005282 [ ]; | EP0370781 [ ] (DIGIORGIO CORP [US]); | US4921891 [ ] (COPE CARROLL W [US]) |