EP0440505 - Ethylene alpha-olefin polymer substituted mannich base useful as multifunctional viscosity index improver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.05.1996 [1996/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC. 200 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | For all designated states EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC. 200 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gutierrez, Antonio 22 Tar Heels Road Mercerville, New Jersey 08619 / US | 02 /
Lundberg, Robert Dean 4 Brian Drive Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | 03 /
Song, Won Ryul 36 Dorset Lane Short Hills, New Jersey 07078 / US | [1991/32] | Representative(s) | Northover, Robert Frank, et al Exxon Chemical Limited Exxon Chemical Technology Centre P.O. Box 1 Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/32] | Northover, Robert Frank, et al Exxon Chemical Limited Exxon Chemical Technology Centre PO Box 1 Abingdon Oxfordshire, OX13 6BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 91300839.7 | 01.02.1991 | [1991/32] | Priority number, date | US19900473582 | 01.02.1990 Original published format: US 473582 | [1991/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0440505 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0440505 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0440505 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C10M129/91, C10M159/16, C08F8/02, C08F8/32, C08F210/16, C10L1/22, // (C10N20/04, 30:00, 30:02) | [1992/01] | CPC: |
C08F8/02 (KR);
C08F8/44 (EP);
C10L1/221 (EP);
C10L1/2493 (EP);
C10M129/91 (KR);
C10M159/16 (EP,KR);
C10M2215/04 (EP);
C10M2215/042 (EP);
C10M2215/22 (EP);
C10M2215/221 (EP);
C10M2215/225 (EP);
C10M2215/226 (EP);
C10M2215/26 (EP);
C10M2215/30 (EP);
C10M2217/00 (EP);
C10M2217/02 (EP);
C10M2217/04 (EP);
C10M2217/042 (EP);
C10M2217/043 (EP);
C10M2217/046 (EP);
C10M2217/06 (EP);
C10M2221/00 (EP);
C10M2221/041 (EP);
C10N2040/02 (EP);
C10N2040/04 (EP);
C10N2040/042 (EP);
C10N2040/044 (EP);
C10N2040/046 (EP);
C10N2040/08 (EP);
C10N2040/25 (EP);
C10N2040/251 (EP);
C10N2040/252 (EP);
C10N2040/253 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08F8/44, C08F8/32, C08F210/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/32] | C10M159/16, C10L1/22, // C10N20:04, C10N30:00, C10N30:02 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/32] | Title | German: | Äthylen-alpha-Olefinpolymer substituierte Mannichbase, verwendbar als multifunktionaler Viskositätsindexverbesserer | [1991/32] | English: | Ethylene alpha-olefin polymer substituted mannich base useful as multifunctional viscosity index improver | [1991/32] | French: | Base de mannich substituée par un polymère d'éthylène et d'alpha-oléfine utile comme agent d'amélioration de l'indice de viscosité multifonctionnel | [1991/32] | Examination procedure | 04.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/32] | 23.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/18] | Request for further processing for: | 16.12.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 16.12.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.02.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.04.1991 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   29.04.1991 | 11.04.1991 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   29.04.1991 | 11.04.1991 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   29.04.1991 | 11.04.1991 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   29.04.1991 | 11.04.1991 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   29.04.1991 | 11.04.1991 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   29.04.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YP]EP0356010 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]); | [Y]US4070402 (KARLL ROBERT E, et al); | [AD]EP0129368 ; | [A]FR1497320 (STANDARD OIL CO); | [A]FR2195652 (STANDARD OIL CO [US]) |