Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.1993 [1993/32] |
16.04.1992 | Publication of search report | published on 03.06.1992 [1992/23] |
05.07.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.08.1991 [1991/34] |