EP0442646 - Multipass evaporator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.10.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 07.12.1994 [1994/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Modine Manufacturing Company 1500 DeKoven Avenue Racine Wisconsin 53401 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | For all designated states Modine Manufacturing Company 1500 DeKoven Avenue Racine Wisconsin 53401 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hughes, Gregory Gerald 4002 S. 75th Street Milwaukee, Wisconsin 53220 / US | [1991/34] | Representative(s) | Allden, Thomas Stanley, et al A.A. Thornton & CO. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | Allden, Thomas Stanley, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91300922.1 | 05.02.1991 | [1991/34] | Priority number, date | US19900478626 | 12.02.1990 Original published format: US 478626 | [1991/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0442646 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0442646 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/02, F28D1/053 | [1992/02] | CPC: |
F28D1/00 (KR);
F28D1/0535 (EP);
F28F9/0212 (EP);
F28D2021/0084 (EP);
F28D2021/0094 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/34] | F28D1/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/34] | Title | German: | Vielzug-Verdampfer | [1991/34] | English: | Multipass evaporator | [1991/34] | French: | Evaporateur à passes multiples | [1991/34] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 17.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/17] | 30.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1994/49] | 16.07.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3254708 (ODDY EDWARD P); | [YD]US4829780 (HUGHES GREGORY G [US], et al); | [A]US1752235 (GREEN COLLINS WILLIAM) |