EP0441591 - A method for driving a liquid crystal panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1999 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1991/33] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamazaki, Katsunori c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | [1991/33] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/14] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row Holborn London WC1R 4JH / GB | ||
Former [1992/34] | Miller, Joseph J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row, Holborn London WC1R 4JH / GB | ||
Former [1991/33] | Caro, William Egerton J. MILLER & CO. Lincoln House 296-302 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 91300930.4 | 05.02.1991 | [1991/33] | Priority number, date | JP19900026415 | 06.02.1990 Original published format: JP 2641590 | [1991/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0441591 | Date: | 14.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0441591 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0441591 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [1991/33] | CPC: |
G09G3/3622 (EP);
H04N3/127 (EP);
G09G2320/0209 (EP);
G09G2320/0247 (EP);
G09G2320/041 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/33] | Title | German: | Steuerverfahren für eine Flüssigkristallanzeigetafel | [1991/33] | English: | A method for driving a liquid crystal panel | [1991/33] | French: | Méthode de commande d'un panneau d'affichage à cristaux liquides | [1991/33] | Examination procedure | 21.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/29] | 24.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 07.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 14.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/22] | Request for further processing for: | 04.10.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 04.10.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.10.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 10.06.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/22] | FR | 06.11.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0303510 ; | [Y]DE3906924 ; | [A]US4808991 |