EP0443773 - A metal cutting tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISCAR LTD. P.O. Box 11 Tefen 24959 / IL | [1992/14] |
Former [1991/35] | For all designated states ISCAR LTD P.O. BOX 11 Tefen 24959 / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Satran, Amir 6 Moran Street IL-24960 Kfar Havradim / IL | 02 /
Smilovici, Carol 22/12 Hadekel Str. IL-24404 Acre / IL | [1991/35] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/15] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row Holborn London WC1R 4JH / GB | ||
Former [1991/35] | Miller, Joseph J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row, Holborn London WC1R 4JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 91301171.4 | 13.02.1991 | [1991/35] | Priority number, date | GB19900003697 | 19.02.1990 Original published format: GB 9003697 | [1991/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0443773 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0443773 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0443773 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/22 | [1991/35] | CPC: |
B23C5/2208 (EP,US);
B23C2210/166 (EP,US);
Y10T407/192 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1934 (EP,US);
Y10T407/2276 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1991/35] | Title | German: | Metallschneidwerkzeug | [1991/35] | English: | A metal cutting tool | [1991/35] | French: | Outil de coupe à métal | [1991/35] | Examination procedure | 20.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/21] | 28.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1602721 (KRUPP GMBH); | [X]FR2218154 (SANDCO LTD [CA], et al); | [A]EP0247011 (SECO TOOLS AB [SE]); | [X]EP0161505 |