EP0444797 - System for the real-time scheduling and loading of look-up tables for a patterning device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLIKEN RESEARCH CORPORATION Post Office Box 1927 920 Milliken Road Spartanburg South Carolina 29304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | For all designated states MILLIKEN RESEARCH CORPORATION Post Office Box 1927 920 Milliken Road Spartanburg South Carolina 29304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cox, Steven Wayne 7605 Parris Bridge Road, Chesnee, Spartanburg South Carolina 29323 / US | [1991/36] | Representative(s) | Pacitti, Pierpaolo Alfonso, et al Murgitroyd and Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Pacitti, Pierpaolo A.M.E., et al Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | ||
Former [1991/36] | Pacitti, Pierpaolo A.M.E. Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | Application number, filing date | 91301182.1 | 13.02.1991 | [1991/36] | Priority number, date | US19900487673 | 02.03.1990 Original published format: US 487673 | [1991/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0444797 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0444797 | Date: | 10.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D06B11/00 | [1991/36] | CPC: |
D06B11/0059 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/36] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Überwachung eines Färbungsprozesses | [1991/36] | English: | System for the real-time scheduling and loading of look-up tables for a patterning device | [1991/36] | French: | Appareil pour contrôler un processus de teinture | [1991/36] | Examination procedure | 03.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 20.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.04.1996 | CH | 10.04.1996 | ES | 10.04.1996 | FR | 10.04.1996 | GR | 10.04.1996 | IT | 10.04.1996 | LI | 10.04.1996 | SE | 10.07.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 10.04.1996 | |
CH | 10.04.1996 | ||
ES | 10.04.1996 | ||
GR | 10.04.1996 | ||
IT | 10.04.1996 | ||
LI | 10.04.1996 | ||
SE | 10.07.1996 | ||
FR | 06.09.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 10.04.1996 | |
CH | 10.04.1996 | ||
GR | 10.04.1996 | ||
IT | 10.04.1996 | ||
LI | 10.04.1996 | ||
SE | 10.07.1996 | ||
FR | 06.09.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 10.04.1996 | |
CH | 10.04.1996 | ||
IT | 10.04.1996 | ||
LI | 10.04.1996 | ||
SE | 10.07.1996 | ||
FR | 06.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/29] | AT | 10.04.1996 | |
CH | 10.04.1996 | ||
LI | 10.04.1996 | ||
SE | 10.07.1996 | ||
FR | 06.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/14] | AT | 10.04.1996 | |
SE | 10.07.1996 | ||
FR | 06.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | AT | 10.04.1996 | |
SE | 10.07.1996 | ||
Former [1996/47] | SE | 10.07.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4033154 (JOHNSON HAROLD L); | [A]US4170883 (VARNER GEORGE C [US]); | [A]EP0306568 (DAWSON ELLIS LTD [GB]); | [AP]EP0389109 (MILLIKEN RES CORP [US]) |