EP0445941 - Incrementally increasing density cementing spacer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.1996 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY 515 South Flower Street, P.O. Box 2679 Los Angeles California 90071 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | For all designated states ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY 515 South Flower Street Los Angeles California 90071 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilson, William N. 2513 Grandview Drive Plano, Texas 75075 / US | [1991/37] | Representative(s) | Cropp, John Anthony David, et al MATHYS & SQUIRE 100 Grays Inn Road London, WC1X 8AL / GB | [1991/37] | Application number, filing date | 91301465.0 | 25.02.1991 | [1991/37] | Priority number, date | US19900484260 | 26.02.1990 Original published format: US 484260 | [1991/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0445941 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E21B33/13 | [1991/37] | CPC: |
E21B33/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1991/37] | Title | German: | Zementabstandsbehälter mit stufenweise ansteigender Dichte | [1991/37] | English: | Incrementally increasing density cementing spacer | [1991/37] | French: | Spacer de cimentation ayant une densité augmentant incrémentallement | [1991/37] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 25.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/17] | 23.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/09] | 02.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1996/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1995 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3820602 (MOTLEY H, et al) | [YD] - D. SCHLUMBERGER: "Cementing technology", 1984, Nova Communications Ltd, London, GB; Chapter 9: "Mud removal" |