EP0501047 - Method for manufacturing aluminum foils used as electrolytic capacitor electrodes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.1995 [1995/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Showa Aluminum Kabushiki Kaisha 224-banchi Kaizancho 6-cho Sakaishi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/36] | For all designated states SHOWA ALUMINUM KABUSHIKI KAISHA 224-banchi Kaizancho 6-cho Sakaishi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujihira, Tadao 224-banchi, Kaizancho 6-cho Sakaishi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Kato, Yutaka 224-banchi, Kaizancho 6-cho Sakaishi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Tada, Kiyoshi 224-banchi, Kaizancho 6-cho Sakaishi, Osaka / JP | 04 /
Isayama, Eizo 224-banchi, Kaizancho 6-cho Sakaishi, Osaka / JP | 05 /
Tamura, Takashi 224-banchi, Kaizancho 6-cho Sakaishi, Osaka / JP | 06 /
Goshona, Kenji 224-banchi, Kaizancho 6-cho Sakaishi, Osaka / JP | [1992/36] | Representative(s) | Kerr, Simonne June, et al European Patent Attorney POTTS, KERR & CO. P.O. Box 688 Ascot Berkshire SL5 8YT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/36] | Kerr, Simonne June, et al European Patent Attorney POTTS, KERR & CO. P.O. Box 688 Ascot Berkshire SL5 8YT / GB | Application number, filing date | 91301482.5 | 25.02.1991 | [1992/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0501047 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01G9/04 | [1992/36] | CPC: |
H01G9/0032 (EP);
H01G9/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1992/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Aluminiumfolien und ihre Verwendung als Elektroden für Elektrolytkondensatoren | [1992/36] | English: | Method for manufacturing aluminum foils used as electrolytic capacitor electrodes | [1992/36] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de feuilles d'aluminium et leur utilisation comme électrodes de condensateurs électrolytiques | [1992/36] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 19.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/02] | 14.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/01] | 08.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP63299309 ; | [Y]JP2146718 ; | [A]DE3005727 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 132 (E-736)[3480], 31st March 1989; & JP-A-63 299 309 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND. CO., LTD) 06-12-1988, & JP63299309 A 00000000 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 14, no. 394 (E-969)[4337], 24th August 1990; & JP-A-2 146 718 (SHOWA ALUM. CORP.) 05-06-1990, & JP2146718 A 00000000 |