EP0444882 - Plant transformation process with early identificaton of germ line transformation events [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | For all designated states MONSANTO COMPANY 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis, Missouri 63167 / US | ||
Former [1991/36] | For all designated states AGRACETUS, INC. 8520 University Green Middleton, Wisconsin 53562 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Christou, Paul 26 Sandy Court Madison, Wisconsin 53717 / US | 02 /
McCabe, Dennis E. 8777 Airport Road Middleton, Wisconsin 53562 / US | [1991/36] | Representative(s) | Bentham, Stephen, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | Bentham, Stephen, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 91301545.9 | 26.02.1991 | [1991/36] | Priority number, date | US19900485111 | 26.02.1990 Original published format: US 485111 | [1991/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0444882 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0444882 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0444882 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, C12N15/87 | [1991/36] | CPC: |
C12N15/8207 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/36] | Title | German: | Pflanzentransformationverfahren mit Früherkennung von Keimbahn-Transformationsereignissen | [1991/36] | English: | Plant transformation process with early identificaton of germ line transformation events | [1991/36] | French: | Procédé de transformation de plantes avec détection précoce des événements de transformation de la lignée germurale | [1991/36] | Examination procedure | 08.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/23] | 10.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.01.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20] | Request for further processing for: | 15.01.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 15.01.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.03.1999 | Decision despatched | 18.07.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 18.07.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 11.08.1997 | Decision despatched | 25.04.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 25.04.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 21.05.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 24.05.2000 | [2004/07] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0301749 (AGRACETUS [US]) | [X] - ABSTRACTS VIITH INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS ON PLANT TISSUE AND CELL CULTURE June 1990, AMSTERDAM, THE NETHERLANDS, page 51; CHRISTOU, P., ET AL.: 'Commercialization of a process for the introduction of foreign genes in elite cultivars of soybean using electric discharge acceleration' | [A] - PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY. vol. 14, no. 2, February 1990, DORDRECHT, THE NETHERLANDS. pages 261 - 268; TOMES, D. T., ET AL.: 'Transgenic tobacco plants and their progeny derived by microprojectile bombardment of tobacco leaves' | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA. vol. 86, no. 19, October 1989, WASHINGTON US, pages 7500 - 7504; CHRISTOU, P., ET AL.: Inheritance and expression of foreign genes in transgenic soybean plants' |