EP0444887 - Apparatus and method for converting radioactive energy into electrical energy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.1994 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.1994 [1994/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENESIS ENERGY SYSTEMS, INC. 154 High Street Peebles Ohio 45660 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | For all designated states GENESIS ENERGY SYSTEMS, INC. 154 High Street Peebles, Ohio 45660 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Robert J. 127 Marble Furnace Road Peebles, Ohio 45660 / US | [1991/36] | Representative(s) | Carpmael, John William Maurice, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [1991/36] | Application number, filing date | 91301555.8 | 26.02.1991 | [1991/36] | Priority number, date | US19900487603 | 02.03.1990 Original published format: US 487603 | [1991/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0444887 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G21H1/00 | [1991/36] | CPC: |
G21H1/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/36] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren für die Umwandlung radioaktiver Kraft in elektrische Kraft | [1991/36] | English: | Apparatus and method for converting radioactive energy into electrical energy | [1991/36] | French: | Equipement et méthode pour la conversion d'énergie radioactive en énergie électrique | [1991/36] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 11.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/15] | 21.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/49] | 07.07.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.03.1993 | 28.02.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2552050 (LINDER ERNEST G); | [A]FR1234539 ; | [AD]US3290522 (ROBERT GINELL); | [A]US3578442 (ANDERSON CHARLES G); | [A]US3623947 (HOBSON ROBERT R, et al); | [AD]US4178524 (RITTER JAMES C [US]) |