EP0444902 - Lens edging system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 19.04.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Luxottica Leasing S.p.A. Via Valcozzena 10 32021 Agordo (Belluno) / IT | [2001/47] |
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states BAUSCH & LOMB INCORPORATED One Bausch & Lomb Place Rochester, New York 14604-2701 / US | ||
Former [1991/36] | For all designated states BAUSCH & LOMB INCORPORATED One Lincoln First Square PO Box 54 Rochester New York 14601-0054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Byron, David L. 10 Lantern Lane Honeoye Falls, New York 14472 / US | [1991/36] | Representative(s) | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | ||
Former [1999/14] | Iemenschot, Johannes Andreas, Ir., et al van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | ||
Former [1991/36] | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91301594.7 | 27.02.1991 | [1991/36] | Priority number, date | US19900485426 | 27.02.1990 Original published format: US 485426 | [1991/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0444902 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0444902 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0444902 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/29] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0444902 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B24B9/14, B24B13/06, B24B49/02 | [1992/15] | CPC: |
G05B19/184 (EP);
B24B49/02 (EP);
B24B9/148 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1991/36] | B24B13/06, B24B49/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/36] | Title | German: | Bearbeitungssystem für Linsenränder | [1991/36] | English: | Lens edging system | [1991/36] | French: | Système d'usinage des bords de lentille | [1991/36] | Examination procedure | 30.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/39] | 18.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.1996
30.04.1996
ADMISSIBLE Wernicke & Co. GmbH Jägerstrasse 58 D-40231 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Rehders, Jochen Velten Franz Mayer & Jakoby, Kaistrasse 20 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.1996
30.04.1996
ADMISSIBLE Wernicke & Co. GmbH Jägerstrasse 58 D-40231 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Rehders, Jochen Velten Franz Mayer & Jakoby, Kaistrasse 20 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1996/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.04.1996
30.04.1996
ADMISSIBLE Wernicke & Co. GmbH Jägerstrasse 58 D-40231 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Rehders, Jochen Velten Franz Mayer & Jakoby Postfach 19 02 51 40112 Düsseldorf / DE | 20.05.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.11.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M03) | 21.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 23.01.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.03.1998 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.03.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 08.11.2001 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.11.2001 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.12.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 22.03.2002 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 27.05.1998 | Appeal received No. T0608/98 | 27.07.1998 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.11.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 08.11.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.11.2001 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.07.1995 | DK | 19.07.1995 | GR | 19.07.1995 | NL | 19.07.1995 | SE | 19.10.1995 | LU | 27.02.1998 | AT | 27.02.2001 | GB | 27.02.2001 | CH | 28.02.2001 | ES | 28.02.2001 | LI | 28.02.2001 | [2004/38] |
Former [2004/37] | BE | 19.07.1995 | |
DK | 19.07.1995 | ||
GR | 19.07.1995 | ||
NL | 19.07.1995 | ||
SE | 19.10.1995 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
AT | 27.02.2001 | ||
GB | 27.02.2001 | ||
CH | 28.02.2001 | ||
ES | 28.02.2001 | ||
LI | 28.02.2001 | ||
Former [2003/07] | BE | 19.07.1995 | |
DK | 19.07.1995 | ||
GR | 19.07.1995 | ||
NL | 19.07.1995 | ||
SE | 19.10.1995 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
AT | 27.02.2001 | ||
GB | 27.02.2001 | ||
CH | 28.02.2001 | ||
LI | 28.02.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | BE | 19.07.1995 | |
DK | 19.07.1995 | ||
GR | 19.07.1995 | ||
SE | 19.10.1995 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
AT | 27.02.2001 | ||
GB | 27.02.2001 | ||
CH | 28.02.2001 | ||
LI | 28.02.2001 | ||
Former [2002/14] | BE | 19.07.1995 | |
DK | 19.07.1995 | ||
GR | 19.07.1995 | ||
SE | 19.10.1995 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
AT | 27.02.2001 | ||
Former [2000/05] | BE | 19.07.1995 | |
DK | 19.07.1995 | ||
GR | 19.07.1995 | ||
SE | 19.10.1995 | ||
LU | 28.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 19.07.1995 | |
DK | 19.07.1995 | ||
SE | 19.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/22] | BE | 19.07.1995 | |
SE | 19.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/11] | SE | 19.10.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4233784 (LORETO WILFREDO P); | [A]EP0092364 (HANWELL OPTICAL [GB]); | [A]GB2140719 (HELBRECHT OTTO); | [A]EP0131743 (COBURN OPTICAL IND [US]); | [A]US4656590 (ACE RONALD [US]); | [A]EP0235021 (TOKYO OPTICAL [JP]); | [A]EP0236182 (TOKYO OPTICAL [JP]); | [A]EP0281754 (GERBER SCIENT PRODUCTS INC [US]); | [AD]US4870784 (RAMOS ROLANDO P [US], et al) |