EP0445967 - Improved gas chromatography methods and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.1995 [1995/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF DAYTON 300 College Park Avenue Dayton Ohio 45469-0102 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF DAYTON 300 College Park Avenue Dayton, Ohio 45469 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rubey, Wayne A. 621 Damian Street Vandalia, Ohio 45377 / US | [1991/37] | Representative(s) | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 91301648.1 | 28.02.1991 | [1991/37] | Priority number, date | US19900488191 | 05.03.1990 Original published format: US 488191 | [1991/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0445967 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0445967 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/30 | [1991/37] | CPC: |
G01N30/30 (EP,US);
G01N2030/3007 (EP,US);
G01N2030/3015 (EP,US);
G01N2030/3023 (EP,US);
G01N30/60 (EP,US);
G01N33/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/37] | Title | German: | Verbesserte gaschromatisches Verfahren und Vorrichtung | [1991/37] | English: | Improved gas chromatography methods and apparatus | [1991/37] | French: | Procédé et appareil améliorés de chromatographie en phase gazeuse | [1991/37] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 07.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/50] | 08.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/39] | 18.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3213596 (GILL HARRY A); | [Y]FR2156043 (BECKER DELFT NV); | [Y]FR2344838 (VERGNAUD JEAN [FR]); | [X]WO8302007 (BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) | [A] - JOURNAL OF HIGH RESOLUTION CHROMATOGRAPHY AND CHROMATOGRAPHY vol. 3, no. 3, Mar |