EP0444936 - Exposure apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ebinuma, Ryuichi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Mizusawa, Nobutoshi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kariya, Takao, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Suda, Shigeyuki, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Uzawa, Shunichi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1991/36] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91301656.4 | 28.02.1991 | [1991/36] | Priority number, date | JP19900049583 | 02.03.1990 Original published format: JP 4958390 | [1991/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0444936 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0444936 | Date: | 11.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0444936 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20, G03B27/53, G03F9/00 | [1991/50] | CPC: |
G03F7/70066 (EP,US);
G03F7/70858 (EP,US);
G03F7/70891 (EP,US);
G03F9/70 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/36] | G03B27/53, G03F9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/36] | Title | German: | Belichtungsgerät | [1991/36] | English: | Exposure apparatus | [1991/36] | French: | Appareil d'exposition | [1997/24] |
Former [1991/36] | Appareil de pose | Examination procedure | 27.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/26] | 04.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 11.06.1997 | IT | 11.06.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 11.06.1997 | |
FR | 07.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/19] | FR | 07.11.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0136672 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0253283 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [XD]EP0336537 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]US4875076 (TORIGOE MAKOTO [JP], et al); | [XP]EP0358521 (CANON KK [JP]); | [E]EP0419240 (CANON KK [JP]) |