Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0444937 | Global Dossier | 14.01.1998 | B1 | EP0444937 | 11.12.1991 | A3 | EP0444937 | 04.09.1991 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP11868090 | 10.05.1990 | JP4958390 | 02.03.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69128655T | 07.05.1998 | T2 | DE69128655D1 | 19.02.1998 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP11868090 | 10.05.1990 | JP4958390 | 02.03.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2820310B | 05.11.1998 | B2 | JPH0415907 | 21.01.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP11868090 | 10.05.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5317615 | 31.05.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US98755492 | 08.12.1992 | JP11868090 | 10.05.1990 | JP4958390 | 02.03.1990 | US66240891 | 28.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0444936 | Global Dossier | 11.06.1997 | B1 | EP0444936 | 11.12.1991 | A3 | EP0444936 | 04.09.1991 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP4958390 | 02.03.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69126456T | 06.11.1997 | T2 | DE69126456D1 | 17.07.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP4958390 | 02.03.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2860578B | 24.02.1999 | B2 | JPH03253018 | 12.11.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4958390 | 02.03.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5150391 | 22.09.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4958390 | 02.03.1990 |