EP0447157 - Data format conversion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.07.1998 [1998/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 1 Grand Place CH-1700 Fribourg / CH | [1991/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mcnelis, Paul 55 Glenbirren Park Tram Road Galway / IE | 02 /
Smith, Jonathan, Mark 62 Monalee Heights Knocknacarra Salthill, Galway / IE | 03 /
Kelly, Jean 47 Monalee Manor Knocknacarra Galway / IE | [1991/38] | Representative(s) | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91302013.7 | 11.03.1991 | [1991/38] | Priority number, date | GB19900005697 | 14.03.1990 Original published format: GB 9005697 | [1991/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0447157 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0447157 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0447157 | Date: | 17.08.1993 | [1993/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0447157 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/22 | [1997/29] | CPC: |
G06F40/123 (EP,US);
G06F40/14 (EP,US);
G06F40/151 (EP,US);
G06F40/166 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/38] | G06F15/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/38] | Title | German: | Datenformatumwandlung | [1991/38] | English: | Data format conversion | [1991/38] | French: | Conversion du format des données | [1991/38] | Examination procedure | 22.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/38] | 27.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0186007 (WANG LABORATORIES [US]); | [A]EP0214536 (IBM [US]) | [A] - COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS. vol. 12, no. 2, April 1989, LONDON, GB pages 69 - 79 R. HUNTER ET AL. 'ODA: a document architecture for open systems' | [A] - COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS. vol. 12, no. 2, April 1989, LONDON, GB pages 102 - 106 R. CARR AND F. DAWSON 'Conformance testing of Office Document Architecture (ODA)' | [A] - EDN ELECTRICAL DESIGN NEWS. vol. 32, no. 5, 4 March 1987, NEWTON, MA, US pages 171 - 176 E. MARX ET AL. 'EDIF readers/writers handle data transfer between CAE systems' |