EP0447241 - Electron beam exposure system having an improved data transfer efficiency [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.1997 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fueki, Shunsuke 7-1-16-303, Hiyoshi, Kouhoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223 / JP | [1991/38] | Representative(s) | Fane, Christopher Robin King, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/38] | Fane, Christopher Robin King, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 91302179.6 | 14.03.1991 | [1991/38] | Priority number, date | JP19900063289 | 14.03.1990 Original published format: JP 6328990 | [1991/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0447241 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0447241 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0447241 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/302, H01J37/317 | [1992/04] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
H01J37/3174 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
H01J37/3026 (EP,US);
H01J2237/30416 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/38] | H01J37/317, H01J37/302 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/38] | Title | German: | Elektronenstrahl-Belichtungssystem mit verbesserter Datenübertragungsleistung | [1991/38] | English: | Electron beam exposure system having an improved data transfer efficiency | [1991/38] | French: | Système d'exposition par faisceau d'électrons à efficacité de transfert de données améliorée | [1991/38] | Examination procedure | 25.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/21] | 24.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 12.06.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [1997/17] | FR | 08.11.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4641252 (TOKITA MASAKAZU [JP]); | [A]EP0064639 ; | [A]EP0327093 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) |