EP0453088 - Supported polyolefin catalyst for the (co-)polymerization of ethylene in gas phase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
GB
GR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
AT
BP Chemicals Limited Britannic House, 1 Finsbury Circus London EC2M 7BA / GB | For:FR
BP CHEMICALS S.N.C. Tour Neptune la Défense 1, 20, Place de Seine 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
GB
GR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
AT
BP Chemicals Limited Britannic House 1 Finsbury Circus London EC2M 7BA / GB | ||
For:FR
BP CHEMICALS S.N.C. Tour Neptune la Défense 1, 20, Place de Seine F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | |||
Former [1991/43] | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
GB
GR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
AT
BP Chemicals Limited Belgrave House 76 Buckingham Palace Road London, SW1W 0SU / GB | ||
For:FR
BP CHEMICALS S.N.C. Tour Neptune la Défense 1, 20, Place de Seine F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chamla, Claude, c/o BP Chemicals S.N.C. Tour Neptune, La Defense 1, 20 Place de Seine F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | 02 /
Daire, Erick, c/o BP Chemicals S.N.C. Tour Neptune, La Defense 1, 20 Place de Seine F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | [1991/43] | Representative(s) | Denbigh, Keith Warwick, et al BP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Patents & Agreements Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | Denbigh, Keith Warwick, et al BP INTERNATIONAL LIMITED Patents & Agreements Division Chertsey Road Sunbury-on-Thames Middlesex, TW16 7LN / GB | Application number, filing date | 91302207.5 | 14.03.1991 | [1991/43] | Priority number, date | FR19900004563 | 30.03.1990 Original published format: FR 9004563 | [1991/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0453088 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0453088 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/654, C08F4/655, C08F4/68, C08F10/00 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F4/642 (KR);
Y10S526/904 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/6092 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/43] | Title | German: | Trägerkatalysator für die Gasphasenpolymerisation von Äthylen | [1991/43] | English: | Supported polyolefin catalyst for the (co-)polymerization of ethylene in gas phase | [1991/43] | French: | Catalyseur supporté pour la (co)polymérisation d'éthylène en phase gazeuse | [1991/43] | Examination procedure | 13.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/16] | 03.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.07.1996 | DK | 31.07.1996 | GR | 31.07.1996 | LI | 31.07.1996 | LU | 31.03.1997 | [2000/05] |
Former [1998/15] | CH | 31.07.1996 | |
DK | 31.07.1996 | ||
LI | 31.07.1996 | ||
Former [1997/29] | CH | 31.07.1996 | |
LI | 31.07.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0014523 ; | [XD]EP0133383 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]); | [Y]EP0275675 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]) |