Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
09.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.1995 [1995/44] |
18.08.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 11.10.1995 [1995/41] |
23.09.1994 | (Expected) grant | published on 09.11.1994 [1994/45] |
27.08.1993 | First examination report | |
05.06.1992 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.07.1992 [1992/31] |
31.10.1991 | Publication of search report | published on 18.12.1991 [1991/51] |
02.08.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.09.1991 [1991/38] |