EP0450790 - Poly(aryl ether sulfone)compositions comprising poly(phenylene ether sulfone) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1998 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.05.1998 [1998/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMOCO CORPORATION 200 East Randolph Drive Chicago Illinois 60601 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | For all designated states AMOCO CORPORATION 200 East Randolph Drive Chicago Illinois 60601 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dickinson, Barry Lee 3525 Aubusson Trace Alpharetta, GA 30302 / US | 02 /
Sauers, Marvin Edward 6463 Chestnut Hill Road Flowery Branch, Georgia / US | 03 /
El-Hibri, Mohammad Jamal 2024 Greenhouse Drive Roswell, GA 30076 / US | [1991/41] | Representative(s) | Hall, Marina, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/43] | Dowden, Marina, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1995/39] | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife Beacon House 113 Kingsway GB-London WC2B 6PP / GB | ||
Former [1991/41] | Baverstock, Michael George Douglas BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London, EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91302337.0 | 19.03.1991 | [1991/41] | Priority number, date | US19900505827 | 06.04.1990 Original published format: US 505827 | [1991/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0450790 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0450790 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0450790 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08L81/06 | [1991/41] | CPC: |
A61L2/26 (EP,US);
C08G75/23 (EP,US);
C08L81/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L81/06, C08L81/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/41] | Title | German: | Poly(arylenethersulfon)-Massen enthaltend Poly(phenylenethersulfon) | [1991/41] | English: | Poly(aryl ether sulfone)compositions comprising poly(phenylene ether sulfone) | [1991/41] | French: | Compositions de poly(éthersulfone d'arylène) contenant du poly(éthersulfone de phenylène) | [1991/41] | Examination procedure | 21.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/47] | 19.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 29.01.1996 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]EP0444589 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [A]EP0176989 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]); | [A]US4743645 (HARRIS JAMES E [US], et al) |