EP0448350 - Hand held data processing apparatus having reduced power consumption [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.12.1997 [1997/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/39] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oshima, Mitsuaki 115-3, Katsura, Minamitatsumi-cho Nishikyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu 615 / JP | 02 /
Gohara, Yoshihiro 2-8-13, Kibougaoka, Toyono-cho Toyono-gun, Osaka-fu 563-02 / JP | 03 /
Kobayashi, Yoshinori 9-11 D-45-406, Kourigaoka Hirakata-shi, Osaka-fu 573 / JP | 04 /
Fujiwara, Shozo 1-7-7, Shirakawa Ibaraki-shi, Osaka-fu 567 / JP | 05 /
Uemura, Tsuyoshi 16-3-321, Joushouji-cho Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571 / JP | [1991/39] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/39] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91302365.1 | 19.03.1991 | [1991/39] | Priority number, date | JP19900073737 | 23.03.1990 Original published format: JP 7373790 | [1991/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0448350 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0448350 | Date: | 26.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0448350 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/32, G06F3/14 | [1993/21] | CPC: |
G06F1/3218 (EP,US);
G09G5/36 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0473 (EP,US);
G09G2310/04 (EP,US);
G09G2330/021 (EP,US);
G09G2330/022 (EP,US);
G09G2360/06 (EP,US);
G09G2360/08 (EP,US);
G09G3/3629 (EP,US);
G09G5/40 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1991/39] | G06F1/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/39] | Title | German: | Hand-Datenverarbeitungsgerät mit reduziertem Leistungsverbrauch | [1991/39] | English: | Hand held data processing apparatus having reduced power consumption | [1991/39] | French: | Appareil de traitement de données tenu à la main à consommation d'énergie réduite | [1991/39] | Examination procedure | 17.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/02] | 31.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2134676 (SHARP KK); | [A]EP0121070 (IBM [US]); | [Y]EP0175935 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al); | [A]US4747041 (ENGEL GARY L [US], et al) |