EP0449488 - Process for the preparation of azlactone-functional Michael adducts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/40] | Azlactone Michael adducts | ||
[1998/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/40] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moren, Dean M., c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufact. Co., 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Heilmann, Steven M., c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufact. Co., 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
Krepski, Larry R., c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufact. Co., 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 04 /
Rasmussen, Jerald K., c/o Minnesota Mining and Manufact. Co., 2501 Hudson Road, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [1991/40] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry 52-54 High Holborn London WC1V 6RR / GB | [1998/45] |
Former [1991/40] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91302394.1 | 20.03.1991 | [1991/40] | Priority number, date | US19900500768 | 28.03.1990 Original published format: US 500768 | [1991/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0449488 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0449488 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D263/42, C07D265/06 | [1991/40] | CPC: |
C07D265/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07D263/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von azlacton-funktionellen Michael-Addukten | [1998/45] | English: | Process for the preparation of azlactone-functional Michael adducts | [1998/45] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'adduits de Michael à fonction azlactone | [1998/45] |
Former [1991/40] | Azlactone Michaeladdukte | ||
Former [1991/40] | Azlactone Michael adducts | ||
Former [1991/40] | Produits d'addition Michael des azlactones | Examination procedure | 29.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/04] | 06.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 04.11.1998 | NL | 04.11.1998 | SE | 04.11.1998 | DK | 04.02.1999 | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/07] | BE | 04.11.1998 | |
NL | 04.11.1998 | ||
SE | 04.11.1998 | ||
Former [2002/23] | BE | 04.11.1998 | |
SE | 04.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 04.11.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1202119 (ROEHM & HAAS GMBH [DE]); | [AD]EP0105665 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]EP0333361 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) | [AD] - "Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Engineering,2nd Edition,Vol.11" 1988, Wiley-Interscience, New York | Examination | EP0433034 |