EP0450809 - Method and apparatus for measuring the frequency of a spectral line [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.1995 [1995/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEKTRONIX INC. Howard Vollum Park 14150 S.W. Karl Braun Drive P.O.Box 500, Mail Stop 50-PAT Beaverton Oregon 97077-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states TEKTRONIX INC. Howard Vollum Park 14150 S.W. Karl Braun Drive P.O.Box 500, Mail Stop 50-PAT Beaverton Oregon 97077-0001 / US | ||
Former [1991/41] | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. P.O. Box 1000 Wilsonville, Oregon 97070-1000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Said, Ahmed 8745 S.W. Pacer Drive Beaverton, Oregon 97005 / US | [1991/41] | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis, et al Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/41] | Wombwell, Francis, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 91302436.0 | 20.03.1991 | [1991/41] | Priority number, date | US19900505878 | 06.04.1990 Original published format: US 505878 | [1991/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0450809 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0450809 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01R23/165 | [1991/41] | CPC: |
G01R23/165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zum Messen der Frequenz einer Spektrallinie | [1991/41] | English: | Method and apparatus for measuring the frequency of a spectral line | [1991/41] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour mesurer la fréquence d'une ligne spectrale | [1991/41] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 14.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/28] | 29.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/45] | 12.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB2123155 (GEN ELECTRIC) | [A] - FUNKSCHAU, vol. 52, no. 21, October 1980, MUNCHEN, DE; page 82-89, ARNOLDT: 'AUFBAU UND WIRKUNGSWEISE VON HF-SPEKTRUMANALYSATOREN' | [A] - EDN ELECTRICAL DESIGN NEWS, vol. 34, no. 2, January 1989, NEWTON, MASSACHUSETTS, US; pages 149 - 155, DOVEL: 'FFT ANALYZERSMAKE SPECTRUM ANALYSIS A SNAP' |