EP0497027 - Rotary serial play feature [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Williams Electronics Games, Inc. 3401 N. California Avenue Chicago, Illinois 60618 / US | [1992/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oursler, Barry 548 Chesterfield Lane Barrington, IL 60010 / US | [1994/43] |
Former [1992/32] | 01 /
Oursler, Barry 548 Chesterfield Lane Barrington, IL 60010 / us | Representative(s) | Allman, Peter John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/32] | Allman, Peter John, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 91302584.7 | 25.03.1991 | [1992/32] | Priority number, date | US19910648198 | 31.01.1991 Original published format: US 648198 | [1992/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0497027 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0497027 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A63F7/02 | [1992/32] | CPC: |
A63F7/3065 (EP,US);
A63F7/027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1992/32] | Title | German: | Rotierendes, in Serie angeordnetes Spielelement | [1994/43] | English: | Rotary serial play feature | [1992/32] | French: | Elément de jeu rotatif en série | [1992/32] |
Former [1992/32] | Rotierendes, in serie angeordnetes Spielelement | Examination procedure | 17.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/47] | 27.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 25.03.1995 | ES | 27.03.1995 | [2004/37] |
Former [1996/15] | GB | 25.03.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2073177 (REED JAMES W); | [A]US4311311 (CROSMAN DORLAND L) |