blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0450849

EP0450849 - Catalyst material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition procedure closed
Status updated on  28.11.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JOHNSON MATTHEY PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY
78 Hatton Garden
London EC1N 8JP / GB
[1991/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Buchanan, Jeffrey Stuart
620 American Avenue, Apt No. D407
King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US
02 / Hards, Graham Alan
176 Crowmarsh Hill, Crowmarsh Gifford
Wallingford, Oxfordshire, OX10 8BG / GB
03 / Keck, Lindsey
Box 124 Sunrise Lane, RD 2
Boyertown, PA 19512 / US
[1991/41]
Representative(s)Wishart, Ian Carmichael, et al
Patents Department Johnson Matthey Technology Centre Blount's Court Sonning Common
Reading, RG4 9NH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1991/41]Wishart, Ian Carmichael, et al
Patents Department Johnson Matthey Technology Centre Blounts Court Sonning Common
Reading, Berks RG4 9NH / GB
Application number, filing date91302676.127.03.1991
[1991/41]
Priority number, dateUS1990050194730.03.1990         Original published format: US 501947
[1991/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0450849
Date:09.10.1991
Language:EN
[1991/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0450849
Date:26.08.1992
Language:EN
[1992/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0450849
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.06.1992
ClassificationIPC:H01M4/92, B01J23/42
[1991/41]
CPC:
H01M4/926 (EP,US); H01M4/92 (EP,KR,US); B01J23/42 (EP,US);
B01J23/89 (EP,US); H01M2004/8689 (EP,US); H01M2300/0005 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0008 (EP,US); Y02E60/50 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1991/41]
TitleGerman:Katalysatormaterial[1991/41]
English:Catalyst material[1991/41]
French:Matériau catalyseur[1991/41]
Examination procedure15.02.1993Examination requested  [1993/16]
23.07.1993Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.12.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.1994Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09)
26.06.1995Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.07.1996Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.10.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.11.1999Fee for grant paid
09.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.10.2000  04.12.2000  ADMISSIBLE
OMG AG & Co. KG
Standort Hanau - Postfach 1351
63403 Hanau / DE
Opponent's representative
Herrmann, Reinhard
OMG AG & Co. KG, F&E und Innovationsmanagement, Patente, Postfach 1351
63403 Hanau / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2002/16]
Opponent(s)01  26.10.2000  04.12.2000  ADMISSIBLE
OMG AG & Co. KG
Standort Hanau - Postfach 1351
63403 Hanau / DE
Opponent's representative
Herrmann, Reinhard, Dr.
OMG AG & Co. KG, F&E und Innovationsmanagement, Patente, Postfach 1351
63403 Hanau / DE
Former [2001/23]
Opponent(s)01  26.10.2000  04.12.2000  ADMISSIBLE
dmc2 Degussa Metals Catalysts Cerdec AG / Patente und Marken
Standort Hanau - Postfach 1351
63403 Hanau / DE
Former [2000/52]
Opponent(s)01  26.10.2000   
dmc2 Aktiengesellschaft, Degussa Metals Catalysts Cerdec AG
Postfach 1351
D-63403 / DE
07.12.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.04.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.12.2002Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed
16.12.2002Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2004/03]
Request for further processing for:11.11.1999Request for further processing filed
10.11.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.12.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.02.1993Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.1994Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.1995Renewal fee patent year 05
11.03.1996Renewal fee patent year 06
19.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 07
28.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 08
26.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.01.2000
GR26.01.2000
LU27.03.2000
[2004/39]
Former [2004/07]AT26.01.2000
GR26.01.2000
Former [2001/08]AT26.01.2000
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0149293  (ENGELHARD CORP [US]);
 [A]EP0355853  (N E CHEMCAT CORP [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.