Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH04224575 | Global Dossier | 13.08.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US51080590 | 16.04.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0453159 | Global Dossier | 23.10.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US51080590 | 16.04.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2040518 | 17.10.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US51080590 | 16.04.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4968815 | 06.11.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | US51080590 | 16.04.1990 |