EP0456352 - Rotary, positive displacement machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 16.05.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DRUM INTERNATIONAL LIMITED P.O. Box 178 Edward Street Works Tong Street Bradford West Yorkshire BD4 9SH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/21] | For all designated states DRUM INTERNATIONAL LIMITED P.O. Box 178 Edward Street Works Tong Street Bradford West Yorkshire BD4 9SH / GB | ||
Former [1991/46] | For all designated states THE DRUM ENGINEERING COMPANY LIMITED P.O. Box 178 Edward Street Works Tong Street Bradford West Yorkshire BD4 9SH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmitz, Lother Peter 3A Daleside Grove, Pudsey Lees, West Yorkshire, LS28 8HE / GB | [1991/46] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 91303263.7 | 15.04.1991 | [1991/46] | Priority number, date | GB19900010211 | 05.05.1990 Original published format: GB 9010211 | [1991/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0456352 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0456352 | Date: | 07.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/36] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0456352 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F01C1/12, F01C1/08 | [1991/46] | CPC: |
F01C1/123 (EP,US);
F01C1/084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/46] | Title | German: | Umlaufende Verdrängungsmaschine | [1991/46] | English: | Rotary, positive displacement machine | [1991/46] | French: | Machine rotatif à déplacement positif | [1991/46] | Examination procedure | 16.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/08] | 30.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.06.1995
17.07.1995
ADMISSIBLE LEYBOLD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wilhelm-Rohn-Str. 25 63450 Hanau / DE Opponent's representative Leineweber, Jürgen Patentanwalt Siebachstrasse 47 50733 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.06.1995
17.07.1995
ADMISSIBLE Leybold Aktiengesellschaft Wilhelm-Rohn-Str. 25 D-63450 Hanau / DE Opponent's representative Leineweber, Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys. Aggerstrasse 24 D-50859 Köln / DE | 14.06.1995 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 13.07.1995 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 20.07.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.01.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 30.10.1996 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.11.1996 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 12.04.1997 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 07.09.1994 | DK | 07.09.1994 | GR | 07.09.1994 | LI | 07.09.1994 | LU | 30.04.1995 | [2000/05] |
Former [1998/15] | CH | 07.09.1994 | |
DK | 07.09.1994 | ||
LI | 07.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/13] | CH | 07.09.1994 | |
LI | 07.09.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4224016 (BROWN ARTHUR E); | [AD]US4324538 (BROWN ARTHUR E); | [AD]GB2113767 (INGERSOLL RAND CO); | [A]EP0133629 (INGERSOLL RAND CO [US]) |