EP0453301 - Double receptor polynucleotide assay method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2000 [2000/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dade Behring Marburg GmbH Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76 35041 Marburg / DE | [1999/51] |
Former [1996/10] | For all designated states BEHRINGWERKE Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1140 D-35001 Marburg / DE | ||
Former [1991/43] | For all designated states SYNTEX (U.S.A.) INC. 3401 Hillview Avenue Palo Alto California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ullman, Edwin F. 135 Selby Lane Atherton, California 94025 / US | 02 /
Goodman, Thomas C. 2435 Whitney Drive Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [1991/43] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 91303516.8 | 19.04.1991 | [1991/43] | Priority number, date | US19900511651 | 20.04.1990 Original published format: US 511651 | [1991/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0453301 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0453301 | Date: | 21.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G01N33/50 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6804 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6813 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6816 (EP,US);
Y10S435/81 (EP,US);
Y10S530/81 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6804, C12Q2537/125, C12Q2522/101 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6813, C12Q2563/119, C12Q2521/501 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6816, C12Q2537/125, C12Q2522/101 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/43] | Title | German: | Doppel-Rezeptor-Polynukleotid-Bestimmungsverfahren | [1991/43] | English: | Double receptor polynucleotide assay method | [1991/43] | French: | Méthode d'essai d'une polynucléotide à double récepteur | [1991/43] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/06] | 30.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/42] | 19.05.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0192168 (MOLECULAR DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]); | [Y]WO8912696 (AMGEN INC [US]); | [Y]EP0147665 (MOLECULAR DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]); | [Y]EP0185494 (APPLIED BIOSYSTEMS [US]); | [Y]GB2125964 (CETUS MADISON CORP); | [YD]EP0357336 (SYNTEX INC [US]) | [Y] - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA vol. 86, April 1989, USA pages 2423 - 2427 KEMP, D. ET AL. 'Colorimetric detection of specific DNA segments amplified by polymerase chain reaction' |