EP0487178 - Multiple section photomultiplier tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.1996 [1996/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Burle Technologies, Inc. Suite 1300, 1105 North Market Street P.O. Box 8985 Wilmington, DE 19899 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | For all designated states BURLE TECHNOLOGIES, INC. Suite 1300, 1105 North Market Street P.O. Box 8985 Wilmington, DE 19899 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Helvy, Fred A. 1776 Zarker Road Lancaster, PA 17601 / US | [1992/22] | Representative(s) | Dawson, Elizabeth Ann, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | Dawson, Elizabeth Ann, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91303583.8 | 22.04.1991 | [1992/22] | Priority number, date | US19900615292 | 19.11.1990 Original published format: US 615292 | [1992/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0487178 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0487178 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0487178 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01J43/10, H01J31/48 | [1993/30] | CPC: |
H01J43/045 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/22] | H01J31/48 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/22] | Title | German: | Mehrstufige Fotovervielfacherröhre | [1992/22] | English: | Multiple section photomultiplier tube | [1992/22] | French: | Tube photomultiplicateur à étages multiples | [1992/22] | Examination procedure | 10.01.1994 | Examination requested [1994/11] | 02.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3435233 (FARNSWORTH ROBERT P); | [A]US3899706 (BALL GEOFFREY WILLIAM); | [A]US4523091 (PERSYK DENNIS E [US]); | [Y]DE3709298 (KERNFORSCHUNGSZ KARLSRUHE [DE]); | [Y]US4881008 (KYUSHIMA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) |