EP0454441 - Antimicrobial compositions and process for preparing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.08.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 28.09.1994 [1994/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAUSCH & LOMB INCORPORATED One Lincoln First Square PO Box 54 Rochester New York 14601-0054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/44] | For all designated states BAUSCH & LOMB INCORPORATED One Lincoln First Square PO Box 54 Rochester New York 14601-0054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heiler, David J. 173 Wadsworth Avenue Avon, New York 14414 / US | [1991/44] | Representative(s) | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/44] | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91303691.9 | 24.04.1991 | [1991/44] | Priority number, date | US19900515394 | 27.04.1990 Original published format: US 515394 | [1991/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0454441 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A01N59/00, A01N61/00, A01N25/10, C08F8/00 | [1991/44] | CPC: |
A01N59/00 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A01N59/00, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N59/00, A01N25/10 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/44] | Title | German: | Antimikrobielle Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1991/44] | English: | Antimicrobial compositions and process for preparing the same | [1991/44] | French: | Compositions antimicrobiennes et procédé pour leur préparation | [1991/44] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 13.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/29] | 04.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/39] | 08.05.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.05.1992 | M01   Fee paid on   13.05.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB680968 (GEN ANILINE & FILM CORP); | [A]US3647523 (HORVATH ROLAND J, et al); | [A]US4245129 (GILBERT EVERETT E); | [A]EP0151284 (BASF AG [DE]) |