EP0454453 - Interactive information processing system using natural language [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/44] | Information processing system | ||
[1998/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.2000 [2000/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/44] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rohra, Aruna, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2 Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Matsuoka, Hiroshi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2 Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1991/44] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/44] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91303722.2 | 25.04.1991 | [1991/44] | Priority number, date | JP19900114593 | 26.04.1990 Original published format: JP 11459390 | [1991/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0454453 | Date: | 30.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0454453 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0454453 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06F17/28 | [1998/35] | CPC: |
G06F16/3329 (EP,US);
G06F40/58 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/44] | G06F15/403 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/44] | Title | German: | Interaktives Datenverarbeitungssystem, das die natürliche Sprache benützt | [1998/35] | English: | Interactive information processing system using natural language | [1998/35] | French: | Système de traitement d'information interactif utilisant le langage naturel | [1998/35] |
Former [1991/44] | Datenverarbeitungssystem | ||
Former [1991/44] | Information processing system | ||
Former [1991/44] | Système de traitement d'information | Examination procedure | 26.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/25] | 28.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/24] | Request for further processing for: | 29.04.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 29.04.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.05.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP61015267 ; | [X]GB2153560 (HITACHI LTD); | [X]US4689737 (GRANT RICHARD B [US]); | [X]EP0268367 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 162 (P-466)(2218) 10 June 1986 & JP-A-61 015 267 ( KURAICHIROU KAZAMA ) 23 January 1986, & JP61015267 A 19860123 |