EP0457481 - Triaxial connector adapter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.1993 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.05.1993 [1993/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building, Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/47] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Federico, Panfilo Augostino 239 Maple Lane McKees Rocks, PA 15136 / US | 02 /
Gaussa, Louis William, Jr. 3 Dover Road Irwin, PA 15642 / US | [1991/47] | Representative(s) | Van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 30 The Green Calne Wiltshire SN11 8DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/47] | van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 23, Centre Heights London NW3 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 91304139.8 | 08.05.1991 | [1991/47] | Priority number, date | US19900522766 | 14.05.1990 Original published format: US 522766 | [1991/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0457481 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0457481 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01R17/12, H01R31/06 | [1992/24] | CPC: |
H01R24/568 (EP,US);
H01R31/06 (EP,KR,US);
H01R2103/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/47] | H01R17/12 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1991/47] | Title | German: | Triaxialzwischenverbinder | [1991/47] | English: | Triaxial connector adapter | [1991/47] | French: | Connecteur intermédiaire tri-axial | [1991/47] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 05.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/40] | 27.03.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4674809 (HOLLYDAY ROBERT D [US], et al); | [A]EP0303011 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]DE1590791 (UNITED CARR INC BOSTON) |