Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3133778B | Global Dossier | 13.02.2001 | B2 | JPH05113457 | 07.05.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US52225190 | 11.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0457515 | Global Dossier | 20.07.1994 | B1 | EP0457515 | 21.11.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US52225190 | 11.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE108896T | 15.08.1994 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US52225190 | 11.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69102940T | 12.01.1995 | T2 | DE69102940D1 | 25.08.1994 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US52225190 | 11.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5122755 | 16.06.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US52225190 | 11.05.1990 |