EP0457515 - Capacitive position detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.1995 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEW SD, INC. 1 Post Street, Suite 2500 San Francisco California 94104 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/47] | For all designated states NEW SD, INC. 1 Post Street, Suite 2500 San Francisco, California 94104 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nootbaar, Michael W. 827 Mayo Court Benecia, California, 94510 / US | 02 /
Newell, Gerald R. 219 Gay Court Alamo, California, 94507 / US | [1991/47] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/47] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91304234.7 | 10.05.1991 | [1991/47] | Priority number, date | US19900522251 | 11.05.1990 Original published format: US 522251 | [1991/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0457515 | Date: | 21.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0457515 | Date: | 20.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/24 | [1991/47] | CPC: |
G01D5/2417 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/47] | Title | German: | Kapazitiver Positionsdetektor | [1991/47] | English: | Capacitive position detector | [1991/47] | French: | Capteur capacitif de position | [1991/47] | Examination procedure | 08.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/28] | 06.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.07.1994 | BE | 20.07.1994 | CH | 20.07.1994 | DK | 20.07.1994 | ES | 20.07.1994 | GR | 20.07.1994 | LI | 20.07.1994 | NL | 20.07.1994 | SE | 20.10.1994 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/05] | AT | 20.07.1994 | |
BE | 20.07.1994 | ||
CH | 20.07.1994 | ||
DK | 20.07.1994 | ||
GR | 20.07.1994 | ||
LI | 20.07.1994 | ||
NL | 20.07.1994 | ||
SE | 20.10.1994 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 20.07.1994 | |
BE | 20.07.1994 | ||
CH | 20.07.1994 | ||
DK | 20.07.1994 | ||
LI | 20.07.1994 | ||
NL | 20.07.1994 | ||
SE | 20.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 20.07.1994 | |
BE | 20.07.1994 | ||
CH | 20.07.1994 | ||
LI | 20.07.1994 | ||
NL | 20.07.1994 | ||
SE | 20.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 20.07.1994 | |
BE | 20.07.1994 | ||
CH | 20.07.1994 | ||
LI | 20.07.1994 | ||
NL | 20.07.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 20.07.1994 | |
BE | 20.07.1994 | ||
CH | 20.07.1994 | ||
LI | 20.07.1994 | ||
Former [1995/12] | BE | 20.07.1994 | |
CH | 20.07.1994 | ||
LI | 20.07.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | CH | 20.07.1994 | |
LI | 20.07.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3542030 (HABERLAND RUEDIGER PROF DR ING [DE]); | [A]DE3528416 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]); | [A]DE3732756 (WEINERT E MESSGERAETEWERK [DD]) |