EP0458540 - Communication apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1998 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/48] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Tsunehiro, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1991/48] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/48] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91304454.1 | 17.05.1991 | [1991/48] | Priority number, date | JP19900129122 | 21.05.1990 Original published format: JP 12912290 | JP19900144405 | 04.06.1990 Original published format: JP 14440590 | [1991/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0458540 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0458540 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0458540 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/06, H04N1/32 | [1991/48] | CPC: |
H04N1/32708 (EP,US);
H04N1/00 (KR);
H04M1/715 (EP,US);
H04M11/06 (EP,US);
H04N1/32704 (EP,US);
H04N1/32717 (EP,US);
H04N1/32719 (EP,US);
H04N1/32726 (EP,US);
H04N1/32728 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1991/48] | Title | German: | Kommunikationseinrichtung | [1991/48] | English: | Communication apparatus | [1991/48] | French: | Appareil de communication | [1991/48] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/46] | 20.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/03] | Request for further processing for: | 30.07.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 30.07.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.08.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 28.01.1998 | [2002/25] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2937339 (SIEMENS AG); | [X]US4674115 (KALEITA DAVID L [US], et al); | [AD]US4677660 (YOSHIDA TAKEHIRO [JP]); | [A]US4809317 (HOWE PAUL R [US], et al); | [Y]US4852153 (STRECK DONALD A [US]) |