EP0495285 - Predistortion of shrink film printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.1993 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.03.1993 [1993/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reynolds Metals Company Reynolds Metals Building, 6601 West Broad Street Richmond Virginia 23230-1701 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/30] | For all designated states REYNOLDS METALS COMPANY Reynolds Metals Building, 6601 West Broad Street Richmond, Virginia 23230-1701 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin, Roy M 9510 Newhall Road Richmond, Virginia 23229 / US | [1992/30] | Representative(s) | Bass, John Henton, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [1992/30] | Application number, filing date | 91304570.4 | 21.05.1991 | [1992/30] | Priority number, date | US19900635075 | 28.12.1990 Original published format: US 635075 | [1992/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0495285 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B41F17/00, B41M1/36, B41M1/40 | [1992/30] | CPC: |
B41M5/0005 (EP,US);
B41F17/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/30] | Title | German: | Vorverzerrung vom Schrumpffolie | [1992/30] | English: | Predistortion of shrink film printing | [1992/30] | French: | Prédistortion de l'impression sur feuille rétractable | [1992/30] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 02.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/36] | 10.02.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3873655 (AMBERG STEPHEN W, et al); | [A]US3313667 (FLOOD CARL A) |