EP0462707 - Blind rivet setting tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2001 [2001/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMHART INC. Drummond Plaza Office Park, 1423, Kirkwood Highway Newark Delaware 19711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/52] | For all designated states EMHART INC. Drummond Plaza Office Park, 1423, Kirkwood Highway Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
D'Aquila, Anthony 29 Valley View Road Trumbull, Connecticut 06611 / US | 02 /
Blake, Jeffrey T. 83 Londonderry, Milford New Haven, Connecticut 06611 / US | [1991/52] | Representative(s) | Wetters, Basil David Peter, et al Emhart Patents Department Emhart International Ltd. 177 Walsall Road Birmingham B42 1BP / GB | [1991/52] | Application number, filing date | 91304696.7 | 23.05.1991 | [1991/52] | Priority number, date | US19900556682 | 19.06.1990 Original published format: US 556682 | [1991/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0462707 | Date: | 27.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0462707 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B21J15/06, B21J15/28 | [1991/52] | CPC: |
B21J15/105 (EP);
B21J15/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1991/52] | Title | German: | Blindnietwerkzeug | [1991/52] | English: | Blind rivet setting tool | [1991/52] | French: | Outil à poser des rivets aveugles | [1991/52] | File destroyed: | 08.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 18.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/39] | 31.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.01.1993 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 31.05.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4754643 ; | [Y]GB2189178 ; | [Y]US4901431 |