EP0459768 - Control device for air conditioner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.07.1994 [1994/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 55, Hondori 2-Chome, Keihan Moriguchi-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/49] | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 18, 2 chome, Keihan-Hondori Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katsuki, Hikaru 1182, Hishimachi Kurokawa Kiryu-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | [1991/49] | Representative(s) | Charlton, Peter John Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | Charlton, Peter John Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1991/49] | Charlton, Peter John Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 91304824.5 | 29.05.1991 | [1991/49] | Priority number, date | JP19900141149 | 29.05.1990 Original published format: JP 14114990 | [1991/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0459768 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0459768 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/02 | [1991/49] | CPC: |
F24F11/30 (EP,US);
F24F11/46 (EP,US);
F24F1/0007 (EP,US);
F24F11/62 (EP,US);
F24F11/56 (EP,US);
F24F11/74 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/49] | Title | German: | Kontrollvorrichtung für ein Klimagerät | [1991/49] | English: | Control device for air conditioner | [1991/49] | French: | Dispositif de commande pour un appareil de conditionneur d'air | [1991/49] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/52] | 15.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH06312223B ; | [AP]WO9014563 (MALIK & BLISS PTY LIMITED [AU]) |