EP0465026 - Method of manufactoring a photoelectric device made of hydrogenated amorphous silicon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/02] | Photoelectric device made of hydrogenated amorphous silicon and method of manufacture | ||
[1996/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.1997 [1997/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanbara, Teruhisa 1-8-13 Hata Ikeda-shi, Osaka 563 / JP | 02 /
Kondo, Shigeo 1-16-14 Asahi, Kuzuha Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 91305325.2 | 12.06.1991 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | JP19900174743 | 02.07.1990 Original published format: JP 17474390 | JP19900174751 | 02.07.1990 Original published format: JP 17475190 | [1992/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0465026 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0465026 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0465026 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0224, H01L31/0376, H01L31/075 | [1992/02] | CPC: |
H01L31/202 (EP);
H01L31/022408 (EP);
H01L31/1055 (EP);
Y02E10/548 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/02] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren einer fotoelektrischen Vorrichtung aus hydriertem amorphem Silizium | [1996/44] | English: | Method of manufactoring a photoelectric device made of hydrogenated amorphous silicon | [1996/44] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'un dispositif photo-électrique en silicium amorphe hydrogéné | [1996/44] |
Former [1992/02] | Fotoelektrische Vorrichtung aus hydriertem amorphem Silizium und Herstellungsverfahren | ||
Former [1992/02] | Photoelectric device made of hydrogenated amorphous silicon and method of manufacture | ||
Former [1992/02] | Dispositif photo-électrique en silicium amorphe hydrogéné et méthode de fabrication | Examination procedure | 03.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 24.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4117506 (CARLSON D [US], et al); | [X]US4200473 (CARLSON DAVID E [US]) | [X] - JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY. vol. 135, no. 2, February 1988, MANCHESTER, NEW HAMPSHIRE US pages 431 - 436; S.ARIMOTO ET AL.: 'ANODIC OXYDATION FOR ENHANCEMENT OF FABRICATION YIELD AND EFFICIENCY OF AMORPHOUS SILICON SOLAR CELLS' | [X] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS. vol. 37, no. 9, 1 November 1980, NEW YORK US pages 826 - 828; A.MADAN ET AL.: 'METAL-INSULATOR-SEMICONDUCTOR SOLAR CELLS USING AMORPHOUS Si:F:H ALLOYS' | [XP] - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS. vol. 29, no. 11, November 1990, TOKYO JP pages 2080 - 2081; M.FARAJI ET AL.: 'PHOTOVOLTAIC, I-V AND C-V CHARACTERISTICS OF SnO2/SiO2/a-Si:H/mc-Si:H STRUCTURES' |