EP0463780 - Shampoo composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
Former [1995/27] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
Former [1992/01] | For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | ||
For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hitchen, David Andrew 54 Hillfield Road Little Sutton, Cheshire L66 1JD / GB | [1992/01] | Representative(s) | Mulder, Cornelis Willem Reinier, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/09] | Mulder, Cornelis Willem Reinier, Dr., et al Unilever PLC, Patent Division, Colworth House Sharnbrook, Bedford MK44 1LQ / NL | ||
Former [1992/01] | Tonge, Robert James UNILEVER PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91305460.7 | 17.06.1991 | [1992/01] | Priority number, date | GB19900013801 | 20.06.1990 Original published format: GB 9013801 | [1992/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0463780 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0463780 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0463780 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/06, A61K7/08 | [1992/01] | CPC: |
A61K8/898 (EP,US);
A61K8/362 (KR);
A61K8/0241 (EP,US);
A61K8/11 (EP,US);
A61K8/26 (EP,US);
A61K8/27 (EP,US);
A61K8/29 (EP,US);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61K8/463 (EP,US);
A61K8/4933 (EP,US);
A61K8/73 (EP,US);
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61K8/737 (EP,US);
A61K8/8147 (EP,US);
A61K8/8152 (EP,US);
A61K8/891 (EP,US);
A61Q5/006 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
A61Q5/12 (EP,US);
A61K2800/412 (EP,US);
A61K2800/5426 (EP,US);
A61K2800/621 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/27] |
Former [1992/01] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Shampoozusammensetzung | [1992/01] | English: | Shampoo composition | [1992/01] | French: | Composition sous forme de shampooing | [1992/01] | Examination procedure | 16.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/24] | 23.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.01.1996 | DK | 17.01.1996 | NL | 17.01.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [1998/15] | BE | 17.01.1996 | |
DK | 17.01.1996 | ||
Former [1996/51] | BE | 17.01.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP01224310 ; | [A]JP01121209 ; | [A]JP62004219 ; | [A]GB2015562 (KAO CORP); | [AP]EP0400976 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 549 (C-662)(3897) 7 December 1989 & JP-A-01 224 310 ( KAO CORP. ) 7 September 1989, & JP01224310 A 19890907 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 362 (C-625)(3710) 14 August 1989 & JP-A-01 121 209 ( KAO CORP. ) 12 May 1989, & JP01121209 A 19890512 | [A] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX LATEST Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 87-046607 & JP-A-62 004 219 (LION CORP.) 10 January 1987, & JP62004219 A 19870110 |