EP0465043 - Ejector und its use in a process of aerobically treating water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/02] | Ejector | ||
[1994/34] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 26.01.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INAX CORPORATION 5-1 Koiehonmachi Tokoname-shi, Aichi 479 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states INAX CORPORATION 5-1 Koiehonmachi Tokoname-Shi, Aichi 479 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Tatsuro c/o Inax Corporation, 5-1, Koiehonmachi Tokoname-Shi, Aichi / JP | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91305483.9 | 18.06.1991 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | JP19900159464 | 18.06.1990 Original published format: JP 15946490 | [1992/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0465043 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0465043 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0465043 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/12, C02F3/02 | [1992/28] | CPC: |
B01F23/454 (EP,US);
C02F3/14 (KR);
B01F25/211 (EP,US);
B01F25/312 (EP,US);
B01F25/31242 (EP,US);
B01F23/23 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1992/02] | B01F5/00, C02F3/12, C02F3/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/02] | Title | German: | Ejektor und seine Verwendung in einem Verfahren zur aeroben Wasserbehandlung | [1994/34] | English: | Ejector und its use in a process of aerobically treating water | [1994/34] | French: | Ejecteur et son usage dans un procédé de traitement aérobie de l'eau | [1994/34] |
Former [1992/02] | Ejektor | ||
Former [1992/02] | Ejector | ||
Former [1992/02] | Ejecteur | Examination procedure | 04.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/36] | 19.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.09.1994
GEA Wiegand GmbH Einsteinstrasse 9-15 D-76275 Ettlingen / DE Opponent's representative Fincke, Karl Theodor Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.09.1994
GEA Wiegand GmbH Einsteinstrasse 9-15 D-76275 Ettlingen / DE Opponent's representative Fincke, Karl Theodor, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | 29.06.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.10.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 28.10.1995 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1996/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.08.1994 | BE | 24.08.1994 | CH | 24.08.1994 | DK | 24.08.1994 | IT | 24.08.1994 | LI | 24.08.1994 | NL | 24.08.1994 | SE | 24.11.1994 | ES | 25.11.1994 | LU | 30.06.1995 | [2004/38] |
Former [2000/06] | AT | 24.08.1994 | |
BE | 24.08.1994 | ||
CH | 24.08.1994 | ||
DK | 24.08.1994 | ||
IT | 24.08.1994 | ||
LI | 24.08.1994 | ||
NL | 24.08.1994 | ||
SE | 24.11.1994 | ||
LU | 30.06.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 24.08.1994 | |
BE | 24.08.1994 | ||
CH | 24.08.1994 | ||
DK | 24.08.1994 | ||
IT | 24.08.1994 | ||
LI | 24.08.1994 | ||
NL | 24.08.1994 | ||
SE | 24.11.1994 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 24.08.1994 | |
BE | 24.08.1994 | ||
CH | 24.08.1994 | ||
DK | 24.08.1994 | ||
LI | 24.08.1994 | ||
NL | 24.08.1994 | ||
SE | 24.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 24.08.1994 | |
BE | 24.08.1994 | ||
CH | 24.08.1994 | ||
LI | 24.08.1994 | ||
NL | 24.08.1994 | ||
SE | 24.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/26] | AT | 24.08.1994 | |
BE | 24.08.1994 | ||
CH | 24.08.1994 | ||
LI | 24.08.1994 | ||
NL | 24.08.1994 | ||
Former [1995/16] | AT | 24.08.1994 | |
CH | 24.08.1994 | ||
LI | 24.08.1994 | ||
NL | 24.08.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 24.08.1994 | |
CH | 24.08.1994 | ||
LI | 24.08.1994 | ||
Former [1995/11] | CH | 24.08.1994 | |
LI | 24.08.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO7900895 (WEBB W); | [A]EP0218253 (MITSUBISHI RAYON ENG [JP]) |