EP0463796 - Complete oil analysis technique [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.1996 [1996/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF DAYTON 300 College Park Avenue Dayton Ohio 45469-0102 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/01] | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF DAYTON 300 College Park Avenue Dayton, Ohio 45469 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kauffman, Robert E. 3190 Marigold Court Kettering, OH 45440 / US | [1995/33] |
Former [1992/01] | 01 /
Kauffman, Robert E. 3190 Marigold Court Kettering, Ohio 45440 / US | Representative(s) | Keltie, David Arthur Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/01] | Keltie, David Arthur DAVID KELTIE ASSOCIATES, Audrey House, Ely Place London EC1N 6SN / GB | Application number, filing date | 91305564.6 | 19.06.1991 | [1992/01] | Priority number, date | US19900545842 | 29.06.1990 Original published format: US 545842 | [1992/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0463796 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0463796 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/28, G01N27/48 | [1992/01] | CPC: |
G01N33/2888 (EP,US);
G01N33/28 (KR);
G01N27/48 (EP,US);
G01N33/2805 (EP,US);
G01N33/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/01] | Title | German: | Gesamte Ölanalysentechnik | [1992/01] | English: | Complete oil analysis technique | [1992/01] | French: | Technique complète d'analyse d'huile | [1992/01] | Examination procedure | 11.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/33] | 02.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61020848 ; | [AD]US4744870 (KAUFFMAN ROBERT E [US]); | [A]EP0121739 (TOYODA CHUO KENKYUSHO KK [JP]); | [A]US4741204 (LUCK RUSSELL M [US], et al); | [A]DE3816315 (KIENINGER & OBERGFELL [DE]); | [AP]EP0376920 (JZD VALASSKO SESIDLEM VLACHOVI [CS]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 169 (P-468)(2225) 14 June 1986, & JP-A-61 020848 (HORIBA S.K.K.) 29 January 1986,, & JP61020848 A 19860129 |