EP0465073 - Platinum electroforming and platinum electroplating [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.1998 [1998/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electroplating Engineers of Japan Limited 6-6, Kayabacho 2-chome Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states Electroplating Engineers of Japan Limited 6-6, Kayabacho 2-chome Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katsutugu, Kitada City-Heim Haruhiko 203, Ninomiya 1459-1 Ninomiyamachi, Nakagun, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Soumei, Yarita, Dia-Palace Fuchinobe III, 10-13-90 Fuchinobe 3-chome Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | Perry, Robert Edward, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 91305680.0 | 24.06.1991 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | JP19900170064 | 29.06.1990 Original published format: JP 17006490 | JP19900185241 | 16.07.1990 Original published format: JP 18524190 | JP19910124577 | 30.04.1991 Original published format: JP 12457791 | JP19910124578 | 30.04.1991 Original published format: JP 12457891 | JP19910124579 | 30.04.1991 Original published format: JP 12457991 | [1992/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0465073 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0465073 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0465073 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | [1997/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C25D3/50, C25D1/16 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
C25D3/567 (EP,US);
C25D3/50 (EP,KR,US);
A44C27/002 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/02] | C25D3/50 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1992/02] | Title | German: | Platin-Elektroformung und Platin-Elektroplattierung | [1997/11] | English: | Platinum electroforming and platinum electroplating | [1992/02] | French: | Electroformage de platine et électroplacage de platine | [1992/02] |
Former [1992/02] | Platinum-Elektroformung und Platinum-Elektroplattierung | Examination procedure | 12.07.1991 | Examination requested [1992/02] | 18.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [1998/03] |
Former [1997/43] | DE | 13.06.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1273663 (ENGELHARD IND INC); | [AD]EP0358375 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB]) |