blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0463838

EP0463838 - Lifting clamp [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.01.1993
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip13.01.1993Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.03.1993 [1993/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
J.C. Renfroe and Sons, Inc.
1926 Spearing Street Jacksonville
Florida 32201 / US
[N/P]
Former [1992/01]For all designated states
J.C. Renfroe and Sons, Inc.
1926 Spearing Street
Jacksonville Florida 32201 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Davies, William
Post Office Box 893
Ponte Vedra Beach, Florida / US
[1992/01]
Representative(s)Frost, Dennis Thomas, et al
WITHERS & ROGERS 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn
London, EC1N 2JT / GB
[1992/01]
Application number, filing date91305682.624.06.1991
[1992/01]
Priority number, dateUS1990054243922.06.1990         Original published format: US 542439
[1992/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0463838
Date:02.01.1992
Language:EN
[1992/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.1991
ClassificationIPC:B66C1/48
[1992/01]
CPC:
B66C1/48 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1992/01]
TitleGerman:Hubgreifer[1992/01]
English:Lifting clamp[1992/01]
French:Pince étau de levage[1992/01]
File destroyed:28.09.2001
Examination procedure03.07.1992Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1993/09]
07.10.1992Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1993/09]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]DE2453121  ;
 [A]US4834442  ;
 [AD]US4647098
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.