EP0465146 - Package, particularly for sticks with cotton buds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 25.10.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.1996 | Opposition rejected | published on 11.12.1996 [1996/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER PRODUCTS, INC. Grandview Road Skillman New Jersey 08558-9418 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER PRODUCTS, INC. Grandview Road Skillman, New Jersey 08558 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garçào, Joào Av.Princesa D'Oeste No.1946, Apt.53 Campinas, Sào Paulo / BR | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 91305861.6 | 28.06.1991 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | BR7001136U | 29.06.1990 Original published format: BR 7001136 U | [1994/12] |
Former [1992/02] | deleted | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0465146 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0465146 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/54 | [1992/02] | CPC: |
B65D5/54 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, GB, IT [1992/02] | Title | German: | Verpackung für Wattestäbchen | [1992/02] | English: | Package, particularly for sticks with cotton buds | [1992/02] | French: | Emballage pour coton-tiges | [1992/02] | Examination procedure | 15.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/33] | 04.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.12.1994
09.02.1995
ADMISSIBLE Paul Hartmann Aktiengesellschaft Paul-Hartmann-Strasse D-89522 Heidenheim / DE Opponent's representative Becker, Maria Patentanwältin, Auf dem Haigst 29 70597 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.12.1994
09.02.1995
ADMISSIBLE Paul Hartmann Aktiengesellschaft Paul-Hartmann-Strasse D-89522 Heidenheim / DE Opponent's representative Becker, Maria, Dipl.-Phys. Auf dem Haigst 29 D-70597 Stuttgart / DE | 14.02.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.08.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.08.1995 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 07.10.1995 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 22.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M03) | 26.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 15.07.1996 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 25.07.1996 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1996/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3219181 (VIKTOR DAHM); | [A]US3533549 (GILCHRIST JAMES GORDON); | [A]FR2066431 (FOCKE HEINZ) |