EP0465169 - Method for manufacturing fan blades [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.11.1996 [1996/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hudson Products Corporation 6855 Harwin Drive, P.O. Box 46100 Houston Texas 77036 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states HUDSON PRODUCTS CORPORATION 6855 Harwin Drive, P.O. Box 46100 Houston, Texas 77036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Monroe, Robert C. 5935 West Bellfort Avenue Houston, Texas 77035 / US | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | Purvis, William Michael Cameron, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1992/02] | Application number, filing date | 91305902.8 | 28.06.1991 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | US19900546806 | 02.07.1990 Original published format: US 546806 | [1992/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0465169 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0465169 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/00, B29D31/00 | [1995/48] | CPC: |
B29D99/0028 (EP,US);
B29C70/443 (EP,US);
B29C70/446 (EP,US);
B29C70/541 (EP,US);
B29C2043/3649 (EP,US);
B29C43/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1992/02] | B29C67/14, B29D31/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Gebläseschaufeln | [1992/02] | English: | Method for manufacturing fan blades | [1992/02] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication des aubes d'un ventilateur | [1992/02] | Examination procedure | 21.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/21] | 13.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1145327 (HUDSON ENGINEERING CORP); | [A]FR1303210 (HALDEMANN S A); | [Y]DE2300275 (AUG LAUKHUFF FA); | [A]EP0292086 (HUDSON PRODUCTS CORP [US]); | [A]EP0295758 (BUDD CO [US]); | [A]US4808362 (FREEMAN RICHARD B [US]); | [A]GB2225277 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) |