EP0465254 - Fused thiophene compounds and uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yoshitomi Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For all designated states YOSHITOMI PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 6-9, Hiranomachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakao, Tohru 774-22, Oaza-Higashihama Nakatsu-shi, Oita 871 / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Hiroshi 345, Oaza-Naoe, Yoshitomimachi Chikujo-gun, Fukuoka 871 / JP | 03 /
Yamato, Hirotake 42-1 Oaza-Kanate Nakatsu-shi, Oita 871 / JP | 04 /
Akagi, Takeshi 1-38-11, Sanou Ohta-ku, Tokyo 143 / JP | 05 /
Takehara, Shuzo 684-1, Shimomiyanaga 3-chome Nakatsu-shi, Oita 871 / JP | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | Hardisty, David Robert, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | Hardisty, David Robert, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A IPQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91306095.0 | 04.07.1991 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | JP19900179953 | 06.07.1990 Original published format: JP 17995390 | JP19900232244 | 31.08.1990 Original published format: JP 23224490 | JP19900326644 | 27.11.1990 Original published format: JP 32664490 | JP19910013684 | 11.01.1991 Original published format: JP 1368491 | JP19910075657 | 14.03.1991 Original published format: JP 7565791 | [1992/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0465254 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0465254 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D495/04, A61K31/55, A61K31/395 | [1992/02] | CPC: |
C07D495/04 (EP,US);
C07D513/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/02] | Title | German: | Kondensierte Thiophenverbindungen und deren Verwendung | [1992/02] | English: | Fused thiophene compounds and uses thereof | [1992/02] | French: | Composés condensés de thiophen et leur usage | [1992/02] | Examination procedure | 05.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 09.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.11.1996 | BE | 13.11.1996 | CH | 13.11.1996 | DK | 13.11.1996 | ES | 13.11.1996 | FR | 13.11.1996 | IT | 13.11.1996 | LI | 13.11.1996 | NL | 13.11.1996 | SE | 13.02.1997 | DE | 14.02.1997 | GB | 04.07.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 13.11.1996 | |
BE | 13.11.1996 | ||
CH | 13.11.1996 | ||
DK | 13.11.1996 | ||
ES | 13.11.1996 | ||
IT | 13.11.1996 | ||
LI | 13.11.1996 | ||
NL | 13.11.1996 | ||
SE | 13.02.1997 | ||
DE | 14.02.1997 | ||
FR | 11.04.1997 | ||
GB | 04.07.1997 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 13.11.1996 | |
BE | 13.11.1996 | ||
CH | 13.11.1996 | ||
DK | 13.11.1996 | ||
ES | 13.11.1996 | ||
IT | 13.11.1996 | ||
LI | 13.11.1996 | ||
SE | 13.02.1997 | ||
DE | 14.02.1997 | ||
FR | 11.04.1997 | ||
GB | 04.07.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 13.11.1996 | |
BE | 13.11.1996 | ||
CH | 13.11.1996 | ||
DK | 13.11.1996 | ||
IT | 13.11.1996 | ||
LI | 13.11.1996 | ||
SE | 13.02.1997 | ||
DE | 14.02.1997 | ||
FR | 11.04.1997 | ||
GB | 04.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/30] | AT | 13.11.1996 | |
BE | 13.11.1996 | ||
CH | 13.11.1996 | ||
DK | 13.11.1996 | ||
LI | 13.11.1996 | ||
SE | 13.02.1997 | ||
DE | 14.02.1997 | ||
FR | 11.04.1997 | ||
GB | 04.07.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 13.11.1996 | |
BE | 13.11.1996 | ||
CH | 13.11.1996 | ||
DK | 13.11.1996 | ||
LI | 13.11.1996 | ||
SE | 13.02.1997 | ||
DE | 14.02.1997 | ||
FR | 11.04.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 13.11.1996 | |
BE | 13.11.1996 | ||
CH | 13.11.1996 | ||
LI | 13.11.1996 | ||
SE | 13.02.1997 | ||
DE | 14.02.1997 | ||
FR | 11.04.1997 | ||
Former [1997/44] | AT | 13.11.1996 | |
BE | 13.11.1996 | ||
SE | 13.02.1997 | ||
DE | 14.02.1997 | ||
FR | 11.04.1997 | ||
Former [1997/39] | AT | 13.11.1996 | |
BE | 13.11.1996 | ||
SE | 13.02.1997 | ||
DE | 14.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/29] | AT | 13.11.1996 | |
DE | 14.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 13.11.1996 | |
Former [N/P] | deleted | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0324610 (LILLY INDUSTRIES LTD [GB]); | [A]EP0329168 (BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) |