Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0471442
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
07.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] |
28.12.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] |
25.08.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.10.2000 [2000/41] |
10.09.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.10.1999 [1999/43] |
22.07.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.07.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.04.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
28.04.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.04.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
09.02.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
22.01.1999 |
Change - German title |
published on 10.03.1999 [1999/10] |
09.07.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.07.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.04.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
27.09.1996 |
First examination report |
|
21.09.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.06.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.11.1992 |
Publication of search report |
published on 13.01.1993 [1993/02] |
03.01.1992 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.02.1992 [1992/08] |
03.01.1992 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.02.1992 [1992/08] |