EP0467573 - Subsurface pressure actuated well apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAKER HUGHES INCORPORATED 3900 Essex Lane Suite 1200 Houston TX 77027 / US | [2008/36] |
Former [1992/04] | For all designated states BAKER-HUGHES INCORPORATED 3900 Essex Lane Suite 1200 P.O. Box 4740 Houston Texas 77210-4740 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bangert, Dan 3826 Fawn Creek, Kingwood Texas 77339 / US | 02 /
Rubbo, Richard 54 Dunecht Road, Westhill, Skeane Aberdeenshire, Scotland AB326RH / GB | [1992/04] | Representative(s) | White, Martin David, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | White, Martin David, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 91306198.2 | 09.07.1991 | [1992/04] | Priority number, date | US19900549803 | 09.07.1990 Original published format: US 549803 | [1992/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0467573 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0467573 | Date: | 10.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E21B41/00, E21B33/129, E21B34/10, E21B23/04, E21B43/1185 | [1992/04] | CPC: |
E21B33/1295 (EP);
E21B23/042 (EP,US);
E21B23/00 (EP);
E21B23/04 (EP,US);
E21B34/06 (EP);
E21B34/063 (EP);
E21B34/066 (EP);
E21B34/102 (EP);
E21B41/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/04] | Title | German: | Druck betätigte Vorrichtung im Bohrloch | [1992/04] | English: | Subsurface pressure actuated well apparatus | [1992/04] | French: | Appareil de fond de puits actionné par pression | [1992/04] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 27.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/38] | 02.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/48] | 04.07.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1995 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3233674 (KURT LEUTWYLER) |