EP0467611 - Use of silicon to extend useful life of metal halide discharge lamps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.02.1994 [1994/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roberts, Victor David 3 Garrison Road Burnt Hills, New York 12027 / US | 02 /
Doughty, Douglas Allen 109 Western Avenue Amsterdam, New York 12010 / US | 03 /
Myers, Jennifer Lori 418 Foxwood Drive Clifton Park, New York 12065 / US | [1992/04] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 91306370.7 | 15.07.1991 | [1992/04] | Priority number, date | US19900553303 | 16.07.1990 Original published format: US 553303 | [1992/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0467611 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0467611 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01J61/26, H01J61/82, H01J9/38 | [1992/04] | CPC: |
H01J9/38 (EP,US);
H01J61/00 (KR);
H01J61/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/04] | Title | German: | Siliziumverwendung zur Verlängerung der Lebensdauer von Metallhalogenid-Entladungslampen | [1992/04] | English: | Use of silicon to extend useful life of metal halide discharge lamps | [1992/04] | French: | Utilisation du silicium pour prolonger la vie utile des lampes à décharge aux halogénures | [1992/04] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 09.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/01] | 13.12.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP1161659 ; | [X]US3488540 (VILLAIN JACQUES, et al); | [YD]US4810938 (JOHNSON PETER D [US], et al); | [A]GB1011591 (GEN ELECTRIC) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 433 (E-824)27 September 1989 & JP-A-1 161 659 ( TOSHIBA CORP ) 26 June 1989, & JP1161659 A 19890626 |